RI H7609 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Water Pollution (would Have Section 46-12-39.1 Relating To "no Discharge Certificate Decal - Required" Expire On December 31, 2010 And Have A New Section Relating To "no Discharge Sign - Required" Take Effect On January 1, 2011)
Title
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Water Pollution (would Have Section 46-12-39.1 Relating To "no Discharge Certificate Decal - Required" Expire On December 31, 2010 And Have A New Section Relating To "no Discharge Sign - Required" Take Effect On January 1, 2011)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-08 | Committee postponed at request of sponsor | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-01 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-04-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7609.pdf |