RI H7602 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure--procedure Generally -- Property Exempt From Attachment, Homestead Exemption And Property Tax Exemptions (would Add The Cash Surrender Values And Proceeds Of Life Insurance Policies On The Lives Of Residents Of The State And The Proceeds Of Annuity Contracts Of Residents Of The State To The Category Or Properties Exempt From Attachment By Creditors.)
Title
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure--procedure Generally -- Property Exempt From Attachment, Homestead Exemption And Property Tax Exemptions (would Add The Cash Surrender Values And Proceeds Of Life Insurance Policies On The Lives Of Residents Of The State And The Proceeds Of Annuity Contracts Of Residents Of The State To The Category Or Properties Exempt From Attachment By Creditors.)
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Russell Jackson [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Donald Lally [D] |
Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-05-22 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-05-15 | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2012) | |
2012-05-15 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2012) | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7602.pdf |