RI H7592 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Exploration And Promotion Of Alternative And Renewable Energy Sources In The East Bay
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Exploration And Promotion Of Alternative And Renewable Energy Sources In The East Bay
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
Rep. Richard Morrison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2012) | |
2012-04-05 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2012) | |
2012-03-12 | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7592.pdf |