RI H7588 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines imitation firearm and provide that it is unlawful for any person to change, alter, remove, or obliterate any coloration or markings in any way that makes the imitation firearm look to be an operable firearm. Violation is a misdemeanor.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7588.pdf |