RI H7502 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
amend their comprehensive plans to conform with the state guide plan for bays, rivers, and watersheds
Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-01 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-04-01 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-03-04 | Committee heard and continued | |
2010-03-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7502.pdf |