RI H7498 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- RETIREMENT OF MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES - Allows any peace officer working in a Rhode Island school as a full or part-time resource officer to work in excess of the seventy-five (75) working days in a calendar year, and not have an interruption in their benefits.
Title
Allows any peace officer working in a Rhode Island school as a full or part-time resource officer to work in excess of the seventy-five (75) working days in a calendar year, and not have an interruption in their benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/07/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7498.pdf |