RI H7462 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (governor And Lieutenant Governor To Appear Jointly On The Ballot)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (governor And Lieutenant Governor To Appear Jointly On The Ballot)
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2012) | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7462.pdf |