RI H7442 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- INTERSTATE MEDICAL LICENSURE COMPACT - Requires the state to implement the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact no later than July 1, 2024, and restores access to telemedicine for all residents and allows treatment by out-of-state providers.
Title
Requires the state to implement the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact no later than July 1, 2024, and restores access to telemedicine for all residents and allows treatment by out-of-state providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7442.pdf |