RI H7363 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the required health insurance coverage for hearing aids.
Title
Hearing Aids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-29 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7363.pdf |