RI H7363 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property -- Condominium Law (would Amend Certain Provisions Of Condominium Law Relative To The Allocation Of Limited Common Elements And The Manner Provided)
Title
An Act Relating To Property -- Condominium Law (would Amend Certain Provisions Of Condominium Law Relative To The Allocation Of Limited Common Elements And The Manner Provided)
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] | Rep. Helio Melo [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Vaudreuil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2010-04-29 | House read and passed | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-04-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-04-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7363.pdf |