RI H7342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Bachelors Degree in Three program.
Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-12 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-04 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-26 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-05-26 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Senate Education | |
2010-03-24 | House read and passed | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-03-17 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-03-17 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-02-24 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-10 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7342.pdf |