RI H7320 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Review The Cost And Status Of The State Of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, And Abandoned Properties And Provide Recommendations For Methods To Mitigate The Associated Expenses (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Mitigate The Associated Costs For The State's Vacant And Abandoned Properties, And Would Report Back By May 1, 2023, And Expire On June 30, 2023.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Review The Cost And Status Of The State Of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, And Abandoned Properties And Provide Recommendations For Methods To Mitigate The Associated Expenses (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Mitigate The Associated Costs For The State's Vacant And Abandoned Properties, And Would Report Back By May 1, 2023, And Expire On June 30, 2023.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-05-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/12/2022) |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |