RI H7305 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the general agent and any special agents of the Rhode Island society for the prevention of cruelty to animals while enforcing any of the laws in relation to cruelty of animals pursuant to ยง 4-1-21 to the definition of peace officers.
Title
Arrest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/17/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7305.pdf |