RI H7305 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
be required to be a lawful attorney) upon whom all processes in any action may be served
Title
Sponsors
Rep. Rice [?] | Rep. Michael Rice [D] | Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-03 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-06-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2010-05-04 | House read and passed | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-24 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7305.pdf |