RI H7215 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables some Massachusetts and Connecticut based student's transportation providers without Rhode Island licensed and registered vehicles to operate in Rhode Island, under limited conditions.
Title
Foreign Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7215.pdf |