RI H7165 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-11 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-11 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- COMMERCIAL SEXUAL ACTIVITY - Under certain circumstances, provides immunity from arrest and prosecution for prostitution, procurement of sexual conduct for a fee, loitering for prostitution and soliciting from motor vehicles for indecent purposes.
Title
Under certain circumstances, provides immunity from arrest and prosecution for prostitution, procurement of sexual conduct for a fee, loitering for prostitution and soliciting from motor vehicles for indecent purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-06-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-31 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |