RI H7157 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires children who seek a special limited work permit to successfully complete a worker rights' training program established as funded by the department of labor and training.
Title
Employment Of Women And Children
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2016) |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7157.pdf |