RI H7149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a municipality to publish any public notice in a newspaper within the municipality or any other platform selected by the town or city council of such municipality.
Title
Form And Effect Of Conveyances
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. John Lyle [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7149.pdf |