RI H7104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the deduction from the state income tax for contributions to the tuition savings program from $500 to $1,000 for an individual and from $1,000 to $2,000 for a joint return.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Helio Melo [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7104.pdf |