RI H6376 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new formula for determining a totally and partially disabled injured workers' weekly benefit entitlement. It also eliminates the current ambiguity in an injured workers' entitlement, when he or she suffers a recurrence of disability.
Title
Workers Compensation -- Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-20 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-20 | House | Meeting postponed (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2021) |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |