RI H6341 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names one of the two (2) new conference rooms at the Rhode Island Veterans Home as the "S. Michael Minutelli Memorial Conference Room".
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions -- New Rhode Island Veterans Home Conference Room
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |