RI H6316 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases from three (3) to six (6) years the interval of time within which a city or town must conduct an update of its last real property revaluation.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6316.pdf |