RI H6307 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Michael Hall Of New York City, New York, To Join Meighan Stoops And Benjamin Stuart Binstock In Marriage Within The Town Of Jamestown, Rhode Island, On Or About August 31, 2013.)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (would Allow Michael Hall Of New York City, New York, To Join Meighan Stoops And Benjamin Stuart Binstock In Marriage Within The Town Of Jamestown, Rhode Island, On Or About August 31, 2013.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6307.pdf |