RI H6137 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Rhode Island Port Advisory Council to provide advice and support with respect to coordinating and marketing the commercial maritime resources of all ports in the state.
Title
The Rhode Island Port Advisory Council
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2015) |
2015-04-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6137.pdf |