RI H6125 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Meeting postponed (06/23/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - Meeting postponed (06/23/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides super-priority lien status to fines issued in connection with violations of the state building code, and the state property maintenance code, in the same manner as already provided for boarding and demolition liens.
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Meeting postponed (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2015) |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6125.pdf |