RI H6112 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a veteran's preference in the issuance of state contracts.
Title
Relating To Public Property And Works
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
Rep. Doreen Costa [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6112.pdf |