RI H6111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Powers And Duties Of Fire Districts (would Provide Fire Districts With The Power To Adopt Tax Classification Rates And Operate Under A Previous Fiscal Year's Budget Under Certain Circumstances. Also Subject Fire Districts To Audit Of Accounts And Installation Of Systems.)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Powers And Duties Of Fire Districts (would Provide Fire Districts With The Power To Adopt Tax Classification Rates And Operate Under A Previous Fiscal Year's Budget Under Certain Circumstances. Also Subject Fire Districts To Audit Of Accounts And Installation Of Systems.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2013) |
2013-05-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6111.pdf |