RI H6082 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires common carriers serving New Shoreham to pay landing fees monthly and provide town with monthly accounting and any reports provided to state/federal government.
Title
General Powers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/30/2015) |
2015-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6082.pdf |