RI H6056 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the holder of a wholesaler's Class C license to sell alcohol to manufacturers of food products in connection with the manufacture of such products.
Title
Relating To Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6056.pdf |