RI H6043 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" From February 5, 2019, To May 5, 2021, And Would Expire On July 5, 2021.)
Title
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" From February 5, 2019, To May 5, 2021, And Would Expire On July 5, 2021.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | House read and passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/13/2021) |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2021) |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |