RI H6041 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an opt-out provision for cities and towns regarding the provision in state guide plan regarding affordable housing/related land use provision by providing timely notice with the chief of the division of planning.
Title
Rhode Island Comprehensive Planning And Land Use Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2015) |
2015-04-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6041.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=8180 |