RI H6010 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-04 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-04 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends IOD benefits to police officers/firefighters suffering from post-traumatic stress injuries/provides municipal police/firefighters retiring due to PTSI accidental disability retirement allowance.
Title
Relief Of Injured And Deceased Firefighters And Police Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6010.pdf |