RI H5988 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers jurisdiction over health insurance regulation from the director of business regulation to the office of health insurance commissioner. Also amends statutory provisions related to health insurance to be consistent with the Affordable Care Act.
Title
Health Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2015) |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5988.pdf |