RI H5978 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Endorsing The State's Education Strategic Plan Known As Transforming Education In Rhode Island
Title
House Resolution Endorsing The State's Education Strategic Plan Known As Transforming Education In Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | House read and passed | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-06 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-24 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5978.pdf |