RI H5933 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds probation and parole officers grades 1 and 2 of the department of children, youth, and families and the department of corrections to the definition of peace officer.
Title
Arrest
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2015) |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5933.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=8188 |