RI H5909 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates the distribution of food products containing the drug kratom, a drug of concern for its stimulant and sedative effects, to consumers by the department of health.
Title
Kratom Consumer Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2021-06-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2021) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5909.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5909A.pdf |