RI H5895 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits children under eighteen (18) years of age who are attending career and technical education schools, to participate in career and technical internships or teacher supervised job site training program.
Title
Career And Technical Education
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/10/2015) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2015-04-29 | House | House read and passed |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-04-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |