RI H5851 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for tax refunds in connection with the Historic Preservation Tax Credit program, and would further extend the program to June 30, 2022.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2015) |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5851.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=8167 |