RI H5840 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires candidates for public office and office holders to maintain separate campaign accounts exclusively for campaign funds and would also apply to political action committees.
Title
Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/14/2015) |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/07/2015) |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015) |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |