RI H5809 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all persons operating public motor vehicles to apply for a vehicle identification device for each vehicle so registered. Penalties for violations and suspensions of the identification devices for cause are provided.
Title
Public Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015) |
2015-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5809.pdf |