RI H5753 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that nonprofit hospital, medical and dental service corporations obtain written approval from the insurance commissioner before being allowed to hire persons on a commission basis to solicit subscribers.
Title
Relating To Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Committee continued |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5753.pdf |