RI H5739 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation office equipment greater than ten (10) years old.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
Rep. Doreen Costa [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5739.pdf |