RI H5732 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/11/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/11/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the juror's fees for each day's attendance on the superior court from $15.00 per day to $25.00 per day commencing July 1, 2022, and increases to $35.00 per day commencing July 1, 2023, and thereafter.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/11/2021) |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-28 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5732.pdf |