RI H5725 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from the excise tax any vehicle or trailer with a valuation of five thousand dollars ($5,000) or less.
Title
Excise On Motor Vehicles And Trailers
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Helio Melo [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5725.pdf |