RI H5713 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that one third of all Rhode Island teachers, for the next three years, be trained in the basic emergency and response skills curriculum ("BEARS"), specifically in hand-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation, Heimlich maneuver, and bleeding control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021)
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback