RI H5693 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Workers' Compensation - Procedure (would Reduce The Waiting Periods For Workers' Compensation Filings, Now Variously Twenty-one Or Fourteen Days, To Seven Days.)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations - Workers' Compensation - Procedure (would Reduce The Waiting Periods For Workers' Compensation Filings, Now Variously Twenty-one Or Fourteen Days, To Seven Days.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Donald Lally [D] | Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5693.pdf |