RI H5688 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires mayoral academies to use a random selection process to select eligible public school students who would be invited to attend the mayoral academy.
Title
Mayoral Academies
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Donald Lally [D] |
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5688.pdf |