RI H5680 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates the blasting, creation, and storage of stone dust.
Title
Air Pollution
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-16 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2015-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |