RI H5670 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets specific, up-to-date standards for selected commercial and residential products. These energy and water efficiency standards are based on ENERGY STAR specifications or on standards adopted by various states.
Title
Minimum Energy And Water Efficiency Standards
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5670.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=8228 |