RI H5657 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that healthcare entities and network plans, eff. 1/1/24, include provision in every contract with a provider of mental health/substance use disorders that rates paid pursuant to the contract would be subject to a rate increase at least annually.
Title
Health Care Accessibility And Quality Assurance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5657.pdf |